HI HB1744 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 281, Session Laws of Hawaii 2019 (Act 281), to provide clarification and flexibility in eyewitness identification procedures. Amends the effective date of Act 281 to 9/1/2020. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Eyewitness Identification.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-17-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 294). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 791-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Say. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-18-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-05-20 3:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2184 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.