HI HB1740 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires physicians practicing in Hawaii to accept Medicare patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicare; Physicians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-02HouseRe-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
2016-01-25HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
2016-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-21HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback