HI HB174 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes labeling requirements and import restrictions on imported genetically engineered produce. Authorizes labeling of non-genetically engineered food and creates a private right of action to enjoin violations. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB174 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetically Engineered Organisms; Produce; Labeling; Import

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21SenateThe committee on HTH deferred the measure.
2013-03-21SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2013-03-21SenateThe committee on AGL deferred the measure.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on AGL/CPN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2013-03-19SenateRe-Referred to AGL/CPN/HTH, WAM.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to HTH/AGL/CPN, JDL.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 186).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Johanson, Jordan, Kobayashi, Ohno, Onishi, Oshiro, Say, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Ing, Lowen, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2013-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2013-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Ito, McDermott voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
2013-02-15HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2013-02-13HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Carroll, Evans, C. Lee, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, Tsuji; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Yamane.
2013-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
2013-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Oshiro, Tsuji, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
2013-02-08HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2013-02-07HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Brower, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
2013-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-13 8:30AM in conference room 312.
2013-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2013-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-04-13 9:30AM in House conference room Auditorium.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
2013-01-18HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-17HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback