HI HB1732 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits individuals from carrying an electric gun in or near certain sensitive locations with exceptions. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Guns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | The recommendation was not adopted. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 1 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 4 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Lee. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 9:31AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 258). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matayoshi, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey, Okimoto, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward voting no (12) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, LoPresti, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) LoPresti, McKelvey, Tokioka, Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22. |
2022-02-22 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-08-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2738 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to PSM, JDC.