HI HB1724 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that certain county-issued cards and certificates are not subject to the State's unfair and deceptive practices regulations related to gift certificates. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Gift Certificates.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-17-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 24). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2120 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).