HI HB1720 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for a state income tax deduction for teacher supplies purchased for use in the classroom and for professional development courses; provided that the teacher obtains a written certification from the Department of Education. (HB1720 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 142). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Hashem, Learmont, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |