HI HB1714 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Act 083, 6/9/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Addresses climate change adaptation by establishing the interagency climate adaptation committee under the DLNR to develop a sea level rise vulnerability and adaptation report that addresses sea level rise impacts statewide to 2050. Tasks the office of planning with establishing and implementing strategic climate adaptation plans and policy recommendations using the sea level rise vulnerability and adaptation report as a framework for addressing other statewide climate impacts identified under Act 286, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012. Appropriates funds for staffing and resources. (HB1714 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Majority Package; Climate Change Adaptation Planning; Interagency Climate Adaptation Committee; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-13SenateAct 083, 6/9/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
2014-06-13HouseAct 083, on 6/9/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
2014-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2014-05-01SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
2014-04-30HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
2014-04-29HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
2014-04-29SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2014-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
2014-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 141-14).
2014-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
2014-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 141-14) as amended in (CD 1).
2014-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige.
2014-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Thielen.
2014-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:35PM in conference room 225.
2014-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 225.
2014-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 11:00AM in conference room 225.
2014-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:45AM in conference room 225.
2014-04-14HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
2014-04-14SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Solomon, Ige Co-Chairs.
2014-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
2014-04-14HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Evans, Lowen, Thielen Members.
2014-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
2014-04-10HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2014-04-08HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 542) in amended form (SD 2).
2014-04-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2014-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
2014-04-04SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3392) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2014-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele.
2014-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2014-03-21SenateReported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3034) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2014-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi, Slom.
2014-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
2014-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to ENE/WTL, WAM.
2014-03-04SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-03-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 135).
2014-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 739-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2014-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2014-02-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2014-02-20HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2014-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2014-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
2014-02-14HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2014-02-06HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
2014-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-06-14 8:40AM in House conference room 325.
2014-01-21HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
2014-01-17HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2014-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2344 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback