HI HB1711 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires restaurants that sell children's meals that include a beverage for a single price to make the default beverage a healthy beverage. (HB1711 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, C. Lee, McDermott, Say, Souki, Ward excused (6). |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-01-24 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-01-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 01-24-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2056 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).