HI HB1697 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to provide comprehensive training for teachers and educational officers on sexual health topics that include positive and accurate representations of the lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, queer or questioning, intersex, asexual, other sexual orientations and gender identities, persons of color, and disability communities to destigmatize and promote sexual health. Requires sexual health education programs to include similar sexual health topics to destigmatize and promote sexual health. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Sexual Health Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Okimoto, Quinlan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matsumoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Quinlan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-01 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ohno, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2562 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM.