HI HB1684 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WTL/ENE.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WTL/ENE.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to adopt rules limiting visitor capacity at manta ray aggregation sites. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1684 HD1)
Title
Manta Rays; Aggregation Sites; Limitation on Access
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 238). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 859-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 16-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-24 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Say. |
2014-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 01-24-14 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Prefiled |