HI HB168 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB168
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the planning and design of a memorial to honor service members of the recent conflicts in the Persian Gulf, Iraq, Afghanistan, and the various theaters of the Global War on Terrorism, to be located at the Hawaii State Veterans Cemetery in Kaneohe, on the island of Oahu, and replicas of the memorial to be located at state veterans cemeteries statewide. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Memorials.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 2:10PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Wakai. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Kong, McDermott. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 486) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 228). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1005) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB168 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 312.