HI HB1674 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes discriminatory requirements for mandatory insurance coverage of in vitro fertilization procedures to create parity of coverage for same-sex couples, unmarried women, and male-female couples for whom male infertility is the relevant factor.
Title
Relating To In Vitro Fertilization Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2669 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1674&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1674_.HTM |