HI HB1674 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes restrictions on sugar-sweetened beverages and other beverages served in child care facilities licensed by the Department of Human Services and in existence as of the effective date of this measure. (HB1674 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sugar-Sweetened Beverages Restriction; Child Care Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
2016-02-12HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2016-02-03HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2016-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2016-01-29HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-16 10:00AM.
2016-01-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-29-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2016-01-25HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2016-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2385 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback