HI HB1671 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily establishes the land study bureau classifications and ratings review subcommittee within the land use commission to review and amend land study bureau classifications and ratings of agricultural lands. Repeals on 12/31/ . Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Land Study Bureau Classifications And Ratings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 23). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Branco. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2763 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.