HI HB1670 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a boundary review committee to render decisions on district boundary disputes brought before the land use commission. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Land Use District Boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 140). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Branco. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 449-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 27-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-01-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2762 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to WTL, JDC.