HI HB1670 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires every pickup truck manufactured after 12/31/2021 that is sold, offered for sell, purchased, or operated in the State to be equipped with a seat belt assembly in the bed of the pickup truck. Prohibits any passenger from riding in the bed or load-carrying area of a pickup truck manufactured after 12/31/2021 without being restrained by a seat belt assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-14HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback