HI HB167 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently reinstates the liability protections previously afforded to county lifeguards.
Title
Relating To Tort Liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB167 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB392 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
SB392 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=167&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB167_.HTM |