HI HB1664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to convene a study group to examine the efficiencies and effectiveness, including program outcomes, of DHS's supporting employment empowerment Hawaii work program and submit a report to the legislature prior to the 2021 regular session. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2020-01-29 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 01-29-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HSH, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |