HI HB1655 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a person or company who meets the qualifications of being a marketplace facilitator is the seller of tangible personal property for general excise tax and use tax purposes. Defines "marketplace facilitator" and "referrer". Establishes reporting requirements and penalties for marketplace facilitators and referrers. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Tax On Sales Of Tangible Personal Property.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-20-18 1:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-18-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; English Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 599) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3561) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 3-13-18 and will hold a public decision making on 03-27-18 11:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 267). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Ito, Kong, McDermott, Ohno, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (11) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Kong, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole. |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-01 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |