HI HB1652 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an affidavit on application for voter registration to be included as part of the application for driver's licenses and civil identification cards. Prevents processing of application for driver's licenses or civil identification cards unless voter affidavit is complete or declined. Clarifies that applicant who does not want information electronically transmitted to office of elections must affirmatively decline to register to vote. Effective July 1, 2030. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Elections Package; Voter Registration; Driver's License; Civil Identification Card

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-03-24SenateReported from TRE/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele.
2016-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Slom.
2016-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-23-16 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2016-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on TRE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to TRE/JDL, WAM.
2016-03-10SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 202).
2016-03-08HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-04HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
2016-03-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 868-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
2016-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2016-02-11HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
2016-02-11HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2016-02-05HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Woodson.
2016-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-05-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-01-25HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
2016-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2115 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Referred to JDL/TRE, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback