HI HB1649 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires original equipment manufacturers of digital electronic devices to make diagnostic and repair information available to device owners and independent repair providers.
Title
Relating To Digital Electronic Equipment Repairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-02-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1649&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1649_.HTM |