HI HB1632 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets weight limitations for tour operators and rental vehicles on Hana and Haleakala highways. Establishes user fees to access Hana and Haleakala highways for certain vehicles. Amends the highway development special fund to allow the deposit funds received from the user fees into the special fund and authorizes the fund to be used for the development and improvement of Hana and Haleakala highways. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 340-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |