HI HB1632 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Re-Referred to TRE, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all individuals operating a bicycle to ride within a bicycle lane, if a bicycle lane is available for use, and provides for the assessment of fines for each violation. (HB1632 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Bicycles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateRe-Referred to TRE, JDC/WAM.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to TRE/JDC, WAM.
2018-03-08SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-08SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 264).
2018-03-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18.
2018-03-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-22-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2018-02-16HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 668-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2018-02-14HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2018-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-14-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
2018-01-17HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading
2018-01-11HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback