HI HB1628 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-07-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Education to set a standard for retention of student records of not less than 100 years. Allows the Department of Education to partner with the Hawaii Correctional Industries Program to establish a three-year student records modernization pilot project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Records Management.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-07-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2018-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN/PBS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2018-01-17HouseReferred to EDN/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 3
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading
2018-01-10HousePrefiled.

Same As/Similar To

SB2920 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDU/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-18 2:15PM in conference room 229.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback