HI HB1626 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the Department of Transportation's authority to confer police powers to persons performing services at airports under contract with the department. Clarifies that private detectives and private guards are prohibited from self-identifying as a law enforcement officer, police, or police officer. (HB1626 HD1)
Title
Private Detectives; Private Guards; Law Enforcement Officers; Association with Government Agency Prohibited; Identification; Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 256-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kawakami. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |