HI HB1624 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 727).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 727).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For policies, contracts, plans, and agreements issued or renewed after 12/31/2024, requires the insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for standard fertility preservation services for persons undergoing medically necessary treatment that may cause iatrogenic infertility. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 727). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Moriwaki Co-Chairs. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takenouchi, Sayama, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Amato, Garcia. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 767). |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 507) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3753) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3314) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-20-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 197). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 933-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-02-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-02-24. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 01-31-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2338 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Re-Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM.