HI HB1624 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Act 008, 05/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Act 008, 05/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delays the implementation of the producer licensing requirements amended by Act 152, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, until January 1, 2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Act 008, 05/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). |
2018-05-01 | House | Act 008, on 05/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2018-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Choy excused (1). |
2018-04-17 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 612). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 595) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3014) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 8). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |