HI HB1624 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Recommitted to JUD with Representative(s) Choy, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ito, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting no and Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Hanohano, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that government should not substantially burden religious exercise without compelling justification; applies the compelling interest test to balance religious liberty and competing government interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Religious Freedom Restoration Act; Established

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-13HouseRecommitted to JUD with Representative(s) Choy, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ito, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting no and Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Hanohano, Takumi excused.
2014-02-14HouseRecalled from the committee(s) on JUD following Roll Call vote: 18 Ayes; 28 Noes: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Creagan, Evans, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ing, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morikawa, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Ohno, Onishi, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takayama, Thielen, Woodson, Wooley, Yamashita; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Hanohano, Takumi.
2014-01-17HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
2014-01-15HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2014-01-13HousePrefiled

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback