HI HB1623 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pedestrians to act contrary to the statewide traffic code when a reasonably careful pedestrian would determine that there is no immediate danger of a collision with a moving vehicle.
Title
Relating To Pedestrians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2630 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1623&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1623_.HTM |