HI HB1621 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-06-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Transportation to allow helicopter operations during daylight hours at Kapalua airport.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-05HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-06-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2024-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2024-01-24HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
2024-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2024-01-16HousePrefiled.

Same As/Similar To

SB2891 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback