HI HB1614 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the bonus for teachers who achieve and maintain a current national board certification from $5,000 to $15,000. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2326 (Same As) 2024-01-19 - Referred to EDU, WAM.