HI HB161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the judiciary to purchase civil legal services for low and moderate income persons.
Title
Relating To Civil Legal Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB161 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB130 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
SB130 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=161&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB161_.HTM |