HI HB1598 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily exempting from the general excise tax (GET) amounts received for the sale of cacao from a producer or processed cacao from a processor. Requires the Department of Agriculture to collaborate with other state agencies to determine the best locations for a cacao-processing facility. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1598 HD2)
Title
Cacao
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee on AGL deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 2:55PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 345). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Keith-Agaran voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Choy, Yamashita. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 330) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Riviere. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-11-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |