HI HB1597 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Department of Health for the assessment, planning, and design, of a long-term care facility that admits and treats non-forensic mental health patients for in-patient or out-patient temporary case management. (HB1597 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Mental Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 10
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback