HI HB1593 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of education, in consultation with the office of enterprise technology services, to develop and procure a uniform financial database, with parameters, benefits, and features that are compatible to the software system being implemented by the office of enterprise technology services for use by all state agencies. Appropriates moneys. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Information Technology.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: J.Keohokalole Chair; Inouye, L. Thielen Co-Chairs; Wakai, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 884) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2020) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from TEC/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on TEC/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TEC/GVO, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 332).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1106), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback