HI HB1592 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Interstate Compact to Phase Out Corporate Welfare.
Title
Relating To An Interstate Compact To Phase Out Corporate Welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |