HI HB1592 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain restraints and tethers that endanger or deny sustenance to the dog. Specifies penalties. (HB1592 HD1)
Title
Cruelty to Animals; Restraints; Shelter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 197). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Woodson, McDermott. |
2016-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-16 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-02-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2460 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to JDL, WAM.