HI HB1589 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that if there are 2 or more candidates for a state public office, and a candidate receives the majority of votes for that office in the primary election, that candidate shall be elected. Provides that if none of the candidates receives a majority of votes cast in a primary election for a state public office, the 2 candidates who receive the highest number of votes for that office shall advance to a general election. Repeals constitutional requirements that a candidate for lieutenant governor be elected at the same time and on the same party ticket as a candidate for governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing Amendments To The Constitution Regarding The Election Of State Officials.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback