HI HB1589 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1589
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if there are 2 or more candidates for a state public office, and a candidate receives the majority of votes for that office in the primary election, that candidate shall be elected. Provides that if none of the candidates receives a majority of votes cast in a primary election for a state public office, the 2 candidates who receive the highest number of votes for that office shall advance to a general election. Repeals constitutional requirements that a candidate for lieutenant governor be elected at the same time and on the same party ticket as a candidate for governor.
Title
Proposing Amendments To The Constitution Regarding The Election Of State Officials.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1589 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1589&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1589_.HTM |