HI HB1588 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the Labor Education Advisory Council shall be advisory to the President of the University of Hawaii on all activities and programs of the Center for Labor Education and Research. Requires written responses addressing the Council's advice and adoption of resolutions by the President and Chancellor of the University of Hawaii, West Oahu campus. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Labor Education Advisory Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 7). |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Cochran, Gates, Ichiyama, Kapela, Perruso, Woodson excused (7). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd. |
2024-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 02-08-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, HET, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2187 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.