HI HB1587 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 095, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 095, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the intrastate mutual aid system to allow counties to share resources in times of emergency or in preparation for emergencies. (CD1)
Title
Relating To An Intrastate Mutual Aid System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 095, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 095, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 84-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 84-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Costales, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 906). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Moriwaki, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Riviere, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Eli Co-Chairs; Costales, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 772) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3949) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from PSM/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3454) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 2:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 127). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 816-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-01-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2779 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM.