HI HB1586 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 268, 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Stadium Development District comprising all state land under the Stadium Authority's jurisdiction. Authorizes HCDA to facilitate the development of all state property within the District. Requires a memorandum of agreement for matters affecting the District. Directs DLNR to transfer title of stadium lands to the Stadium Authority. Subjects leases of land within the District to not more than 99 years. Authorizes the issuance of revenue bonds and general obligation bonds. Appropriates funds. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. (HB1586 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Structure Of Government.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 268, 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
2019-07-09HouseAct 268, on 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 183).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 183) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, L. Thielen, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Yamane, Luke, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Thielen.
2019-04-22HouseRe-referred to LAB, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 56
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; L. Thielen, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 883) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Inouye, Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from EET/GVO/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1904) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on EET/GVO/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-19 2:45PM in conference room 211.
2019-04-01SenateRe-Referred to EET/GVO/WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-13SenateRe-Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateRe-Referred to EET/AEN/GVO, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EET/AEN, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 331).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hashimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EEP/LAB/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/LAB/EDB on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to EEP/LAB/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 11
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EEP/LAB/EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback