HI HB1584 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to make recommendations for important agricultural lands by 6/30/2019 or forfeit that right to the Land Use Commission. Extends the period to claim important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credits by 10 years and limits cumulative tax credit to $1,000,000 per tax payer. Appropriates unspecified funds for identification and mapping of important agricultural lands. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Important Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 5:03PM in Conference Room 224. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 3:01PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 224. |
2017-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 2:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, L. Thielen, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 672) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1536) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 368). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 976) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-17 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-17 at 11:30AM. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1584 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 5:03PM in Conference Room 224.