HI HB1583 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Education to evaluate the feasibility and cost-benefit of establishing and implementing a pilot microgrid to provide backup power in the event of a natural disaster or other similar emergency. Authorizes the Department of Transportation to evaluate the feasibility and cost-benefit of a renewable energy microgrid system to provide backup power in the event of a natural disaster or other similar emergency at one facility. Authorizes the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority to establish a microgrid demonstration project. Requires the agencies conducting the evaluations and pilots to report findings and data to the Public Utilities Commission for the Commission to consider in its evaluation of ways to incentivize the installation of renewable energy systems in public facilities that can provide backup power in the event the broader electric grid cannot provide power. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Electric Grid Resiliency.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Wakai, Inouye, Baker Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Woodson, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-17 | House | Re-referred to EEP, LHE, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 881) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/TRS/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1955) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TRS/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/EET, CPH/TRS/WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 3:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU/EET, CPH/WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 134). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 875), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-31 | House | Re-referred to EEP, LHE, CPC, referral sheet 9 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/LHE, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1583 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 224.
Subjects
DOE
DOT
Electric Grid
Feasibility Analysis
Microgrids
NELHA
Pilot Demonstration Project
PUC
Renewable Energy
Sustainable Schools Initiative
DOT
Electric Grid
Feasibility Analysis
Microgrids
NELHA
Pilot Demonstration Project
PUC
Renewable Energy
Sustainable Schools Initiative