HI HB1581 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the governor's coordinator on homelessness to collect and maintain a database of private property owners who give prior consent for homeless service providers to enter an owner's private property, for purposes of administering homeless services to a homeless individual located on that private property. Requires a report to the legislature. Exempts homeless service providers from civil liability relating to trespass that may result from the administration of homeless services. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2810 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness
Homelessness
Liability
Private property
Private Property Owners
Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness
Homelessness
Liability
Private property
Private Property Owners