HI HB1580 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1580
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a clean ground transportation benchmark framework to maximize consumer fuel savings, including a near term 2025 target encouraging electric vehicle infrastructure buildout supporting Hawaii's goal for the reduction and ultimate elimination of the use of imported fuels for ground transportation by 2045. Directs the department of transportation to collaborate with the state energy office to develop recommendations to achieve those benchmarks. Amends the definition of electric vehicle to include fuel cell electric vehicles. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] |
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 225. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 3:10PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 3:10PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 3:10PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; English Co-Chair; Shimabukuro. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Aquino, Lowen Co-Chairs; Say, Tupola. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 671) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-03-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/ETT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-17-17 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 366). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1580 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 225.