HI HB1579 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 150, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 150, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the manner by which the Oahu Regional Health Care System should request operational funding during the transitional period of the Oahu Regional Health Care System from the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to the Department of Health. Extends the deadline by which the transfer shall take place. Requires a report to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2025. Clarifies the procedure for the working group to discuss matters concerning patient privacy and prospective bidders. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 150, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 150, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-29 | House | Deferred one day 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2022-04-28 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22. |
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 770) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3874) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 124). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Eli, Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 337-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2595 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.