HI HB1577 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 060, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 060, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes tow operators to charge a towing surcharge of no more than $35 if the tow involves overturned vehicles. Increases the statutory caps on certain towing charges. Requires that a towing company that charges fees to tow vehicles left unattended on private and public property to accept payment by the vehicle owner for charges by cash, credit card, and debit card and not direct an individual to use an on-site automated teller machine in lieu of accepting payment by credit card and debit card. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Towing Fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Act 060, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161). |
2024-06-24 | House | Act 060, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 57-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 57-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Nakashima, Kila, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 5:00PM in conference room 329. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 772). |
2024-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 9:57AM in conference room 329. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kila, Onishi, Matsumoto. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 498) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3730) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:45AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-21-24 3:05PM; CR 224. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-19-24 3:05PM; CR 224. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TCA, CPN. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 73). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 867-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 86-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-01-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |