HI HB1574 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Okimoto, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the offense of unlawful shipment of e-liquid products. Includes e-liquid within the definition of "tobacco products", as used in the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law. Increases the license fee for persons engaged as a wholesaler or dealer of cigarettes and tobacco products. Increases the retail tobacco permit fee for retailers engaged in the retail sale of cigarettes and tobacco products. Allocates a portion of collected excise taxes on tobacco products to the Tobacco Prevention and Control Trust Fund. Repeals certain provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes relating to electronic smoking devices. (HB1574 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electronic Smoking Products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Okimoto, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 640) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Creagan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:35PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Gates, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 149) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1405 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1385).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback