HI HB1572 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority. Transfers jurisdiction and functions relating to commercial harbors and commercial maritime operations from the Department of Transportation to the Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 11:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback